IL HB2693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act. Creates the Cardiac Arrest Data Collection Fund and makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Provides that all moneys in the Fund shall be used by the University of Illinois Hospital to support statewide quality improvement efforts to address disparities in cardiac arrest care. Provides that all eligible hospitals in the State shall pay an annual fee of $3,500 that shall be deposited into the Fund. Defines "eligible hospital" to mean a hospital operated under the University of Illinois Hospital Act or licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act that receives reimbursement from the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Provides that the University of Illinois Hospital shall use the moneys in the Fund for specified purposes.
Title
CARDIAC ARREST DATA FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2693&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2693.htm |