IL HB2690 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Allows the county board to impose an additional fee of $10 to $30 on convictions and grants of supervision for felonies, misdemeanors, petty offenses, and business offenses, to be used to support Court Appointed Special Advocate services. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-CASA FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0331 |
2013-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2013 |
2013-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 013-001-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-025-000 |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 004-001-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |