IL HB2688 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Act. Provides that the State of Illinois enters into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact and sets forth the provisions of the Compact. Provides that the purposes of the Compact are to increase public access to professional psychological services by allowing for telepsychological practice across state lines and temporary in-person services in which the psychologist is not licensed to practice psychology, enhance the states' ability to protect the public's health and safety, encourage the cooperation of Compact States in the areas of psychology licensure and regulation, facilitate the exchange of information between Compact States regarding psychologist licensure, adverse actions, and disciplinary history, promote compliance with the laws governing psychological practice in each Compact State, and invest all Compact States with the authority to hold licensed psychologists accountable through the mutual recognition of Compact State licenses. The Compact contains provisions concerning home state licensure, Compact privilege to practice telepsychology, Compact temporary authorization to practice, conditions of telepsychology practice in a receiving state, adverse actions, additional authorities invested in a Compact State's psychology regulatory authority, a coordinated licensure information system, establishment of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Commission, rulemaking, oversight, dispute resolution and enforcement, and the date of implementation of the Compact.
Title
PSYCH INTERJURIS COMPACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2688&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2688.htm |