IL HB2685 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that except as provided in the Code, it is unlawful to have in his or her possession the green hides of fur bearing mammals without a valid hunting or trapping license. Provides that the annual fee for each resident fur buyer's permit (rather than a resident retail or wholesale fur buyer's permit) shall be $50.00 (rather than $25.00 for a resident retail fur buyer's permit or $125.00 for a resident wholesale fur buyer's permit). Provides that all fur buyers and non-resident auction participants shall maintain records of the receipt, collection, purchase, and sale of green hides of fur-bearing mammals. Provides that a record of each transaction shall be created at the time it is executed specifying the date, numbers, and kinds of green hides purchased, sold, or transferred, price paid for each green hide, if any, and the name, address, and Department customer identification number of the other party. Provides that a person who holds a fur tanner's permit is exempt from provisions for a resident fur buyer permit holder as long as the person is not engaged in the business of receiving green hides for the purpose of buying or selling the hides, whether green, dressed, processed, or tanned and the hides which have been tanned or processed are returned to the person who submitted the hides for processing or tanning. Repeals a provision regarding the receiving, collecting, or buying of green hides of fur-bearing or game mammals. Makes other conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-TRAPPING-GREEN HIDES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.35Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.11Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
52053.14Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.15Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.16Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.16aAmended CodeCitation Text
52053.18Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.19Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.20Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback