IL HB2684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Eliminates provision that a licensee under the Act shall not knowingly carry a firearm on any bus, train, or form of transportation paid for in whole or in part with public funds, and any building, real property, and parking area under the control of a public transportation facility paid for in whole or in part with public funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEAL CARRY-PUBLIC TRANSPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback