IL HB2680 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, beginning in 2020, the limit on salary for all purposes under the Code for Tier 2 firefighters shall annually be increased by the lesser of 3%, including all previous adjustments, or the annual unadjusted percentage increase in the consumer price index-u (rather than one-half the annual unadjusted percentage increase in the consumer price index-u) for the 12 months ending with the September preceding each November 1, including all previous adjustments. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DNST FIRE-TIER 2 SALARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseTo Administrative and Substantive Pension Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback