IL HB2673 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery to offer a special instant scratch-off game with the title of "The End of Alzheimer's Begins With Me". Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Alzheimer's Awareness Fund. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Effective immediately.
Title
ALZHEIMER'S SCRATCH-OFF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2673&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2673.htm |