IL HB2673 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that the circuit court has jurisdiction over all persons alleged to be in need of psychotropic medication or electroconvulsive therapy, whether or not they are charged with a felony. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDDC-CIRCUIT CT JURISDICTION
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. David Leitch [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0179 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 3-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |