IL HB2668 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to develop child opportunity zones as a means to deliver comprehensive and coordinated social services at or near schools in this State that are related to specific community needs and that will ultimately increase student performance in schools in the community; defines "child opportunity zone". Provides that a child opportunity zone must provide a means to integrate education, health, and social services into schools and link families to school and community resources. Provides that on or before August 1, 2020, and on or before each August 1 thereafter, the State Board must submit a report to the General Assembly on the number of children and families served by a child opportunity zone program and any other outcome data for each program. Requires the State Board to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CHILD OPPORTUNITY ZONE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-05-28SenateArrive in Senate
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-011-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-007-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.176New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback