IL HB2666 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates a veterans' standard homestead exemption. Provides that the exemption applies only for the first taxable year after the veteran acquires an ownership interest in the property. Provides that the amount of the exemption is a reduction from the property's equalized assessed value in the amount of: (1) $5,000 if the property has an equalized assessed value of $250,000 or less; or (2) $10,000 if the property has an equalized assessed value of more than $250,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-VETERANS HOMESTEAD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-166New CodeSee Bill Text
3520015-167Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback