IL HB2665 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Guardianship and Advocacy Act. Provides that the State Guardian shall provide a training program that outlines the duties and responsibilities of guardians appointed for adults with disabilities under the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the training program shall be offered to courts at no cost, and shall outline the responsibilities of guardians and the rights of persons with disabilities in adult guardianships. Provides that in developing the training program content, the State Guardian may consult with various entities. Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a person may not act as the guardian of an adult with a disability until he or she has completed a training program developed by the State Guardian or by another suitable provider approved by the court. Exempts from the training requirements public guardians, state guardians, attorneys currently authorized to practice law, and persons who are certified as National Certified Guardians by the Center for Guardianship Certification. Provides that at the conclusion of a hearing on a petition to terminate the adjudication of disability or revoke or modify letters of appointment, the court may require the guardian to complete the training program. Provides that the Governor may designate, without the advice and consent of the Senate, the Office of State Guardian as an interim public guardian to fill a vacancy in one or more counties. Provides that the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission shall provide public guardians with information about certification requirements and procedures for testing and certification offered by (instead of "professional training opportunities and facilitate testing and certification opportunities at locations in Springfield and Chicago with") the Center for Guardianship Certification. Effective one year after becoming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GUARDIAN-TRAINING PROGRM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0483
2017-09-08HouseEffective Date September 8, 2018
2017-09-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 061-034-000
2017-06-22HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-06-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-021-000
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Silverstein
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-29SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-26SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-001
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-003-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-02-24HouseTo Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20395533.5New CodeSee Bill Text
755511a-21Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
755513-1Amended CodeCitation Text
755513-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2665&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0483.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2665sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2665_04252017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2665_05312017_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2665_06252017_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback