IL HB2664 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that if a contractor is assessed liquidated damages by the State, the contractor is still responsible to each subcontractor under the subcontracts. For contracts with the Department of Transportation, provides that if a contractor is assessed a liquidated damages penalty equal to or exceeding the total amount of the contract and the contractor is unable to pay its subcontractors, the Department of Transportation shall verify completion of the work performed by the subcontractor and, upon successful verification, pay the subcontractor the amount owed on the subcontract with the contractor.
Title
PROMPT PAYMENT-SUBCONTRACTORS
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0376 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-012-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |