IL HB2664 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0576
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0576
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vehicle Code, State Finance Act, and Clerks of Courts Act. Increases the fine for an excessive idling violation from $50 to $250 for the first conviction and from $150 to $500 for a second or subsequent conviction within a 12 month period. Specifies how the fines collected shall be distributed and provides alternate distribution procedures for circuit clerks for excess idling violations. Creates the Trucking Environmental and Education Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Provides that all money deposited into the Trucking Environmental and Education Fund shall be paid, subject to appropriation by the General Assembly, to the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency for the purpose of educating the trucking industry on air pollution and preventative measures specifically related to idling. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-EXCESSIVE IDLING FINES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0576 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date August 18, 2009 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-22 | Third Reading - Passed; 032-013-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Verified | |
2009-05-14 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Environment; 005-004-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-04-23 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Environment | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-036-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-04-01 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |