IL HB2663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that early childhood programs receiving State Board of Education grants for preschool educational programs shall prohibit the expulsion of children. Provides instead that when persistent and serious challenging behaviors emerge, the early childhood program shall document steps taken to ensure that the child can participate safely in the program and utilize a range of community resources. Sets forth provisions concerning the creation of a transition plan if there is documented evidence that all available interventions and supports recommended by a qualified professional have been exhausted; temporary removal of a child; the utilization of training, technical support, and professional development resources; and annually reporting to the State Board. Makes related changes. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969 to require the Department of Children and Family Services, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Early Childhood Development and the State Board of Education, to adopt rules prohibiting the use of expulsion due to a child's persistent and serious challenging behaviors in licensed day care centers, day care homes, and group day care homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY CHILDHOOD PROGRAM-EXPEL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-020-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.71Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.71aAmended CodeCitation Text
225105.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback