IL HB2662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that in order to receive payment under the Act, State agencies shall submit all invoices to the State Comptroller within 30 days after receiving sufficient information to create a proper bill or invoice. Provides that no contracts shall be entered into by a State agency without appropriation authority for the term of the contract. Effective immediately.
Title
PROMPT PAY-INVOICES/CONTRACTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 540 | 3-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |