IL HB2657 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an alternative retail electric supplier and alternative gas supplier shall: make certain information available on its website; send a separate written notice or electronic mail informing the residential customer of the upcoming change in price or other charge; and not automatically renew a contract with a residential customer at a rate higher than the initial term of the contract or automatically change or renew a fixed contract to a variable rate contract. Provides that all marketing materials shall contain the Historical Price to Compare from the immediately preceding 12 months. Provides, with exceptions, that beginning 90 days after the effective date of the Act, no customer who has received specified financial assistance within the preceding 12 months shall be switched to an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier. Provides that beginning January 1, 2021, an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier may apply to the Illinois Commerce Commission to offer a savings guarantee plan. Provides that every alternative retail electric supplier and alternative gas supplier shall include specific information on bills issued to a residential customer. Provides that every electric utility or gas utility that provides delivery and supply services shall include specific information on each bill to a residential customer who obtains supply from an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning electric service provider selection and alternative gas suppliers.
Title
UTILITIES-ELECTRIC & GAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-115A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115E | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 19-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2DDD | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2EE | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2657&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2657.htm |