IL HB2654 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall provide training to frontline employees at veterans service organizations established under the Act on mental health services to identify veterans who might be at risk of suicidal thoughts. Provides that the training may include, but not be limited to, mental health first aid training and amplified suicide advanced training programs. Provides that the Department shall provide assistance to Veterans Assistance Commissions established under the Military Veterans Assistance Act and veterans' service associations, including, but not limited to, the American Legion, Veterans of Foreign Wars, and AMVETS, in providing the training. Provides that the Department shall find combat veterans to serve as veteran service officers at veterans service organizations established under the Act for the purpose of having veteran services officers who are able to properly relate to fellow combat veterans. Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS' SUICIDE TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052hNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback