IL HB2652 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Energy Efficient Building Act. Provides that references to the International Code Council's International Energy Conservation Code includes Appendix RB. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-ENERGY CONSERVATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20312510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback