IL HB2651 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Container Fee and Deposit Act. Provides for a deposit value of 5 cents to be paid by consumers on each beverage container sold in the State by a dealer for consumption. Provides that upon the return to a dealer or person operating a redemption center, the dealer or redemption center shall pay the value of the deposit back to the consumer as a refund. Sets forth requirements for the administration of the program. Provides certain exemptions to the program. Requires that the refund value be clearly indicated on all beverage containers sold in the State. Provides for the Environmental Protection Agency to certify redemption centers. Prohibits snap-top beverage containers. Provides that persons violating the Act shall be guilty of a Class C misdemeanor. Prohibits the manufacture of certain plastic metal beverage containers. Prohibits the disposal of beverage containers at sanitary landfills. Provides that deposits not passed on to the consumer through bottle redemption shall be distributed as follows: 75% to the Agency for environmental and conservation-related programs, and 25% to each distributor in proportion to the amount of beverage containers each distributor sold in the State. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Illinois Container Fee and Deposit Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECYCLING-BEVERAGE CONTAINER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback