IL HB2650 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act, and running for a period of 5 years after that date, the Environmental Protection Agency shall prioritize within its annual intended use plan the usage of a portion of the Agency's capitalization grant for federally authorized set-aside activities. Provides that the prioritization is for the purpose of supporting disadvantaged communities and utilities throughout Illinois in building their capacity for sustainable and equitable water management. Provides specified methods of support.
Title
IEPA-WATER REVOLVING FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0143 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 031-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |