IL HB2649 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Creates the Task Force on Children of Incarcerated Parents. Provides for membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Office of the Lieutenant Governor shall provide administrative and technical support to the Task Force and shall be responsible for administering its operations, appointing a chairperson, and ensuring that the requirements of the Task Force are met. Provides that the Task Force shall have all appointments made within 30 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the first meeting shall be held no later than August 1, 2019. Provides that the Task Force shall review available research, best practices, and effective interventions to formulate recommendations. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor by December 31, 2019. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INCARCERATED PARENTS-CHILDREN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0480 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-02 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-04-01 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 106F-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 106F-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | Art. 106F headin | New Code | See Bill Text |