IL HB2643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0076
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Adds to the definition of "pedestrian with a disability" a person who may require the use of a mobility device, service animal, or white cane to travel on the walking, running, or bicycle paths of this State. Provides that if the Governor takes public notice of Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day (October 15) and issues a proclamation, he may discuss the history of laws protecting pedestrians with disabilities and may emphasize the need of all citizens to keep safe and functional for persons with disabilities the walking, running, or bicycle paths of this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEDESTRIAN-DISABILITY-PATHS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0076
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6256020Amended CodeCitation Text
625605Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback