IL HB2639 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Reenacts certain Sections that were repealed on June 1, 2018. Provides for their continuation and validation, and extends their repeal to June 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC BUILDING COMMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0479 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 20 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 23.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |