IL HB2637 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to the requirement that all contracts for the purchase of supplies and materials or work involving an expenditure in excess of $25,000 or a lower amount as required by school board policy be awarded to the lowest responsible bidder, exempts contracts for goods or services procured through a cooperative organized in any state in the United States of America or the District of Columbia that awards contracts by a competitive process and whose membership is limited to governmental agencies. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CONTRACT BIDS EXCEPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2637&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2637.htm |