IL HB2630 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Acupuncture Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Acupuncture Practice Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Acupuncture and East Asian Medicine Practice Act. Allows for the practice of East Asian medicine. Makes changes to the definition of "acupuncture" and "acupuncturist". Defines "East Asian medicine". Removes the definition of "referral by written orders". Removes language allowing a physician or a dentist to refer by written order a patient to an acupuncturist and maintain management of the patient. Adds provisions concerning guest practitioners of acupuncture and East Asian medicine. Changes the name of the Board of Acupuncture to the Board of Acupuncture and East Asian Medicine and allows licensed practitioners of East Asian medicine to be members of the Board. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall issue a license to an applicant that submits proof of a demonstration of status as a Diplomate of Acupuncture or Diplomate of Oriental Medicine with the National Certification Commission for Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine or an equivalent credential approved by the Department (rather than passing the National Certification Commission for Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine examination or an equivalent examination). Makes changes in provisions concerning titles and designations that can be used by those licensed under the Act. Makes conforming changes in the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act, the Tattoo and Body Piercing Establishment Registration Act, and the Professional Service Corporation Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ACUPUNCTURE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0375 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-03-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-03-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 20.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 2 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 2 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 10 | 3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |