IL HB2629 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $12,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants to the Illinois YouthBuild Coalition. Effective July 1, 2017 .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DHS-YOUTHBUILD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-09-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback