IL HB2627 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the High Risk Home Loan Act. Includes within the definition of the term "high risk home loan" a consumer credit transaction that is secured by the consumer's principal personal dwelling if the dwelling is personal property. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGH RSK HOME LOAN PERSNL PROP
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0150 |
2015-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2015 |
2015-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-001-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-034-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 021-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 137 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |