IL HB2626 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Parental Rights for the Blind Act. Contains statements of legislative findings and purpose. Defines terms. Provides that a person's blindness shall not serve as a basis for denial or restriction of parenting time, the allocation of parental responsibilities, participation in adoption proceedings, foster care placement, or guardianship appointment. Provides that if a person's blindness is alleged to have a detrimental impact on a child, the party raising the allegation bears the burden of proving by clear and convincing evidence that the blindness endangers or will likely endanger the health, safety, or welfare of the child. Provides that if the burden is met, the person with blindness shall have the opportunity to demonstrate that the implementation of supportive parenting services will alleviate any concerns that have been raised. Provides that the court may require that the supportive parenting services be put in place, with an opportunity to review the need for continuation of the services within a reasonable period of time. Provides that if a court determines that a blind person's parental rights should be denied or limited in any manner, the court shall make specific written findings stating the basis for such a determination and why the provision of supportive parenting services is not a reasonable accommodation that must be made to prevent such denial or limitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARENTAL RIGHTS FOR THE BLIND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0075
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 086-006-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-004-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-003-000
2017-03-08HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
2017-02-24HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback