IL HB2625 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Family Leave Insurance Act. Requires the Department of Employment Security to establish and administer a family leave insurance program. Provides family leave insurance benefits to eligible employees who take unpaid family leave to care for a newborn child, a newly adopted or newly placed foster child, or a family member with a serious health condition. Authorizes family leave of up to 12 weeks during any 24-month period. Authorizes compensation for leave in the amount of 85% of the employee's average weekly wage subject to a maximum of $881 per week. Contains provisions concerning disqualification from benefits; premium payments; the amount and duration of benefits; the recovery of erroneous payments; hearings; defaulted premium payments; elective coverage; employment protection; coordination of family leave; defined terms; and other matters. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the State Benefits Fund. Effective January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMILY LEAVE INSURANCE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-24HouseTo Wage Policy & Study Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback