IL HB2624 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Health Insurance Rate Review Act. Creates the independent quasi-judicial Health Insurance Rate Review Board to ensure insurance rates are reasonable and justified. Sets forth duties and prohibited activities concerning the Board. Creates the Health Insurance Rate Review Board Nomination Panel to provide a list of nominees to the Governor for appointment to the Health Insurance Rate Review Board. Sets forth the procedures for nomination. Provides requirements and procedures for health carriers to file current and proposed rates and rate schedules with the Health Insurance Rate Review Board. Provides that the Board shall review and approve or disapprove all rates and rate schedules filed or used by a health carrier. Sets forth provisions concerning rate standards, public notice, hearings, and the disapproval and approval of rates and rate schedules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH INS RATE REVIEW ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 062-045-000
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-17SenatePostponed - Insurance
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-18SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-26HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-29HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Consumer Protection Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseRe-assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback