IL HB2623 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to ensure that: pediatricians ask about the presence of guns in homes and distribute safe gun storage information to individuals with guns in a home with a child; and safe gun storage information is available at all Secretary of State driver services facilities. Provides that the Department may utilize existing public or private programs to implement these provisions. Requires the Department to disseminate safe gun storage information on its website and in Department facilities. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
IDPH-SAFE GUN STORAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2623&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2623.htm |