IL HB2619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a juvenile may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility if the juvenile is 13 years of age or older (rather than 10 years of age or older). Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-15HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-720Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback