IL HB2619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a juvenile may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility if the juvenile is 13 years of age or older (rather than 10 years of age or older). Makes conforming changes.
Title
JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |