IL HB2617 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that a policy of accident or health insurance shall provide coverage for medically necessary expenses for standard fertility preservation services when a necessary medical treatment may directly or indirectly cause iatrogenic infertility to an enrollee. Defines "iatrogenic infertility". Provides that in determining coverage for these expenses, an insurer shall not discriminate based on an individual's expected length of life, present or predicted disability, degree of medical dependency, quality of life, or other health conditions, nor based on personal characteristics, including age, sex, sexual orientation, or marital status. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-FERTILITY PRESERVATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 76 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 076-030-001
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-010-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 082-021-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-003-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-03-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-004-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
2151304003Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.25New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-16.8Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2617&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2617sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2617_04272018_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2617_05222018_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2617sam001_05312018_025000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback