IL HB2616 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation Prevention Act. Provides that it is unlawful to make available a device that makes content accessible on the Internet unless the product contains digital blocking capability that renders inaccessible a website displaying obscene material, defined under the Criminal Code of 2012, and, if sold to a minor, the digital blocking capability is active. Permits the blocking capability to be deactivated if certain steps are undertaken. Provides a remedy if non-obscene material is blocked. Imposes a nominal fee upon devices for which blocking capability is disabled to be remitted to a fund to help the State bear the costs of upholding community standards and of combating sex crimes. Permits retailers to charge a separate opt-in fee for profit. Authorizes the Attorney General or a consumer to seek damages. Provides affirmative defenses and exemptions. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to include the Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation Prevention Act within the list of Acts subject to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practice Act. Effective one year after becoming law.
Title
HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Tabled |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-27 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2616&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2616.htm |