IL HB2612 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Boundary Changes Article of the School Code. Makes changes concerning the purpose and applicability of the Article; defining "legal resident voter"; school districts in educational service regions of 2,000,000 or more inhabitants; changing boundaries by detachment or dissolution; petitions for dissolution; the requirements for granting petitions; copies of a petition; a detachment set aside upon petition; petition filing, notices, hearings, and decisions; the Administrative Review Law; a limitation on successive petitions; the effective date of a change; maps showing changes; teacher transfer; the annexation of dissolved non-operating districts; termination of offices; a limitation on contesting boundary changes; and the applicability of the amendatory Act. Repeals provisions concerning county references, a change of boundaries in 2 or more counties, special charter districts, an election ordered by the regional superintendent of schools, the annexation of territory eliminated from a non-high school district, the title to school sites and buildings, and the distribution of accumulated funds. Makes related changes in other Articles of the School Code. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BOUNDARY CHANGES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-001-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.35BNew CodeSee Bill Text
105512-24Amended CodeCitation Text
105516-2Amended CodeCitation Text
105532-4.6Amended CodeCitation Text
10555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-01Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-01aNew CodeSee Bill Text
10557-01bNew CodeSee Bill Text
10557-04Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10557-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-12Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-13Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-2.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-27Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-28Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-29Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-2aAmended CodeCitation Text
10557-30Repealed CodeCitation Text
10557-31New CodeSee Bill Text
10557-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-7Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10557-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback