IL HB2611 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Protection of All Property from Warrantless Searches Act. Prohibits a government agent from entering a home or private land without a search warrant except: (1) after receiving the permission of the property owner, lessee, or occupant; (2) to respond to a life-threatening emergency or another immediate threat to public safety that was either reported to the government agent or the government agent personally observed; (3) to prevent the imminent unlawful killing of wildlife or the destruction of evidence of such unlawful killing where the government agent has probable cause to believe either is about to occur; (4) to dispatch crippled or distressed wildlife the government agent has personally observed; or (5) to apprehend a fleeing subject that the government agent has probable cause to believe is on the property. Provides that any evidence obtained pursuant to a search and seizure conducted in violation of the Act is inadmissible in any administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding. Provides that any arrest made pursuant to a search or seizure conducted in violation of the Act is invalid. Allows a person who believes the person's rights have been violated under the Act to bring an action for actual damages. Allows a prevailing plaintiff in such an action to recover declaratory relief, injunctive relief, compensatory damages, nominal damages, and attorney's fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECT PROP-NO WARRANT SEARCH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2023-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback