IL HB2611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that public officials shall report to the Secretary of State when an individual has been adjudicated under the Juvenile Court Act or the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and has committed a violation of a provision in the Snowmobile Registration and Safety Act or the Boat Registration and Safety Act relating to the offense of operating a snowmobile or a watercraft while under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof. Provides that public officials shall forward a report on any disposition of court supervision for an individual's violation of a provision in the Snowmobile Registration and Safety Act or the Boat Registration and Safety Act relating to the offense of operating a snowmobile or a watercraft while under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-REPORT TO SOS-DUI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0074 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |