IL HB2610 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may implement an electronic motor vehicle liability insurance policy verification program to verify insurance coverage of motor vehicles required to be operated with liability insurance under the Code. Provides for information that an insurance company authorized to sell motor vehicle liability insurance in this State shall make available upon request to the Secretary. Provides that if the Secretary implements the program, he or she shall verify insurance coverage at least twice per calendar year and, if unable to verify coverage, shall provide the vehicle owner written notice allowing the owner 30 calendar days to provide proof of insurance on the date of the attempted verification or proof that the vehicle is inoperable. If the vehicle owner provides proof of insurance, the Secretary may verify the proof with the vehicle owner's insurance company. If the vehicle owner fails to respond to the notice or is unable to provide proof of coverage or proof that the vehicle is inoperable, the Secretary shall suspend the vehicle's registration. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Act. Changes the title of the Act to the Illinois Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention and Insurance Verification Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall appoint members of the Council (rather than the Governor) and the Director of the Department of State Police shall be the Chairman of the Council. Provides that the Council shall provide funding to the Secretary for the creation, implementation, and maintenance of an electronic motor vehicle liability insurance policy verification program. Makes conforming changes. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-INS-ELECTRONIC VERIFY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0373 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-001 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4005 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 4-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-603.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 7-604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |