IL HB2607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that, upon notification by the Department of Revenue's Debt Collection Bureau that any member of a board is delinquent in any debt owed to the State, the board shall withhold that delinquent amount from the member's compensation and shall remit the delinquent amount to the Department. Expands the definition of "board" to include boards where members are appointed by the Governor, subject to Senate confirmation, and who receive a salary (currently, only such boards where members are paid per meeting). Effective immediately.
Title
STATE BOARD-WITHHOLDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 3B-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 3B-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2607&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2607.htm |