IL HB2606 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no public service announcement or advertisement that is on behalf of any State administered program and contains the proper name, image, or voice of any executive branch constitutional officer or member of the General Assembly shall be posted on any social media platform (in addition to the existing prohibition on such announcements and advertisements in other media). Makes conforming changes.
Title
ETHICS-SOCIAL MEDIA-ADS & PSAS
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2606&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2606.htm |