IL HB2604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-065-001
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-065-001
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Modifies a Section concerning the notary public official seal and signature to remove references to ineffective language concerning the signature. Provides references to the use of "electronic communication" in a Section concerning notice and advertisement of notary public services. Modifies the maximum fees for notarial acts. Modifies the penalty for a violation of certain provisions concerning fees for notarial acts. Requires all notaries public to provide itemized receipts (currently, receipts) and keep records for fees accepted for services provided. Provides that at the time of a notarial act, a notary public shall officially sign every notary certificate and affix the rubber stamp seal clearly and legibly using black ink, so that it is capable of photographic reproduction. Provides that the illegibility of certain required specified information does not affect the validity of a transaction. Modifies a Section concerning prohibited acts by notaries public.
Title
NOTARY PUBLIC-MISC CHANGES
Sponsors
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 37 N: 65 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-065-001 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-001-001 |
2017-03-08 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-24 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 312 | 3-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |