IL HB2600 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that an election authority shall appoint panels as needed of 3 election judges from the list of election judges submitted by the county parties to compare the voter's signature on the certification envelope of the vote by mail ballot with the signature of the voter on file in the office of the election authority. Provides the procedure for verifying or rejecting the signature. Provides that if a vote by mail ballot is rejected, the election authority shall notify the voter within 2 days after the rejection or within one day if the rejection occurs after election day and in all cases before the close of the period for counting provisional ballots. Allows a voter to submit a statement confirming the vote if the signature was rejected. Allows a voter to cast a new ballot if the vote by mail ballot was rejected because the envelope was delivered opened.
Title
ELEC CD-VOTE BY MAIL
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 19-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2600&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2600.htm |