IL HB2600 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Disability Integration Act. Provides that no public entity or long-term service or support (LTSS) insurance provider shall deny an individual with an LTSS disability who is eligible for institutional placement community-based long-term services and supports that enable the individual to live in the community and lead an independent life. Sets forth specific acts of discrimination by a public entity or LTSS insurance provider that are prohibited under the Act, including: (i) imposition or application of eligibility criteria or another policy that prevents or tends to prevent an individual with an LTSS disability from receiving a community-based long-term service or support; (ii) failure to establish an adequate rate or other payment structure that is necessary to ensure the availability of a workforce sufficient to support an individual with an LTSS disability in living in the community and leading an independent life; and (iii) failure to ensure that each institutionalized individual with an LTSS disability is regularly notified of the alternative of community-based long-term services and supports and that those community-based long-term services and supports are provided if the individual with an LTSS disability selects such services and supports. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to: (1) prevent a public entity or LTSS insurance provider from providing community-based long-term services and supports at a level that is greater than the level that is required under the Act; or (2) prohibit a public entity or LTSS insurance provider from using managed care techniques, as long as the use of such techniques does not have the effect of discriminating against an individual as prohibited under the Act. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL DISABILITY INTEGRATION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-15HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback