IL HB2595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of U.S. Coast Guard license plates. Provides that an applicant shall pay $26 for the original issuance of the plate, in addition to any appropriate registration fees. Of this fee, $11 shall be deposited into the Illinois Veterans' Homes Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that for each registration renewal period, an applicant shall pay a $26 fee in addition to any appropriate registration fees. Of this fee, $24 shall be deposited into the Illinois Veterans' Homes Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-US COAST GUARD PLATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0073
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback