IL HB2594 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish an electronic system to accept online payments for assessments for certain minor traffic violations issued under the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that the Department shall determine which violations are subject to the system and shall provide notice to a person who is eligible for its use. Provides that the Department shall charge a nominal fee of $2.50 for each transaction to maintain the system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-ONLINE PAYMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-440New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback