IL HB2594 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-12 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-12 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governmental Joint Purchasing Act. Authorizes the Division of Forensic Services of the Department of State Police to purchase supplies and services made available by the Federal Acquisition Regulations System, and as allowed for by the federal government for state governmental entities. Provides that such procurements made by the Division of Forensic Services are presumptively approved methods of source selection under the Illinois Procurement Code without further source selection approval required from the chief procurement officers established under the Illinois Procurement Code. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ST POLICE-ONLINE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |