IL HB2591 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-001
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-07HouseRe-assigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback