IL HB2589 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall assign a caseworker to attend any hearing involving youth placed on aftercare release, including hearings involving sanctions for violation of aftercare release conditions and aftercare release revocation hearings. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-DCFS-AFTERCARE-REV

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-27HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-27HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-27House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-001-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-15HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2.5-70Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-3-9.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback