IL HB2585 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Notice By Publication Act and the Newspaper Legal Notice Act. Provides that, if notice is required to be published in a newspaper that is published in a particular unit of local government or school district, and if there is no newspaper published in that unit of local government or school district, then the notice may be published in a secular newspaper having general circulation within the unit of local government or school district (currently, those Acts require the newspaper to be published in the county in which the unit of local government or school district is located or in an adjoining county). Provides that the newspaper shall cause the notice to be placed (instead of "place the notice") on the statewide website established and maintained as a joint venture of the majority of Illinois newspapers as a repository for such notices. Amends the Legal Advertising Rate Act. Provides that the face of type of any required public notice shall not be (instead of "be made shall be not") smaller than the body type used in the classified advertising in the newspaper in which the required public notice is published.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGAL NOTICES-ADJACENT COUNTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0072
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
715102Amended CodeCitation Text
715103Amended CodeCitation Text
715151Amended CodeCitation Text
71552Amended CodeCitation Text
71552.1Amended CodeCitation Text
71553.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback